ERMIINGTON AND DISTRICT WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1016280
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2007

Total income: £1,299
Total expenditure: £1,445

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 January 1993: Standard registration
  • 13 February 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2004 31/10/2005 31/10/2006 31/10/2007
Total gross income £1.33k £1.81k £1.81k £1.30k
Total expenditure £1.25k £2.17k £1.90k £1.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2007 26 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2006 06 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2005 27 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2004 08 March 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 Not Required