M ST J WAY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1016457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £268.07k £390.02k £535.60k £231.53k £399.18k
Total expenditure £62.07k £126.30k £104.49k £106.50k £128.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £322.51k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £213.09k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £104.49k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £80.99k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A