Accounts and annual returns TERRINGTON ST CLEMENT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1016773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 14 February 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 15 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 13 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 05 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 09 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required