STANLEY PARK JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the pupils at the School by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities and resources for education at the School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 29 January 1993: Standard registration
- STANLEY PARK JUNIOR SCHOOL P T A (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lana Roberts | Chair | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Michelle Norris | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.49k | £5.54k | £4.62k | £5.18k | £7.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.26k | £3.83k | £5.97k | £5.55k | £4.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1044 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1044 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1409 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1409 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1774 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1774 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JANUARY 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
STANLEY PARK ROAD
CARSHALTON
SURREY
SM5 3JL
- Phone:
- 02086477497
- Email:
- office@spjs.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window