Financial history HDSK

Charity number: 1016818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £537.35k £400.84k £482.06k £346.84k £546.88k
Total expenditure £529.16k £416.46k £472.47k £339.95k £561.39k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £185.53k N/A N/A N/A £264.71k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £252.28k N/A N/A N/A £170.12k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £24 N/A N/A N/A £2
Income - Other £99.52k N/A N/A N/A £112.05k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £528.35k N/A N/A N/A £560.26k
Expenditure - Raising funds £805 N/A N/A N/A £1.13k
Expenditure - Governance £1.15k N/A N/A N/A £975
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0