EQUATORIA CIVIC FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Throughout England And Wales
- Sudan
Governance
- 09 February 1993: Standard registration
- 26 March 2007: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JANUARY 1993
Charitable objects
1) TO ALLEVIATE THE POVERTY AND DISTRESS SUFFERED BY SOUTHERN SUDANESE IN EXILE AS WELL AS THOSE IN REFUGEE CAMPS LOCATED WITHIN AND WITHOUT THE SOUTH OF SUDAN 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF AND ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST IN THEIR REHABILITATION 3) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE CONDITIONS OF THE REFUGEES AND PUBLISH THE RESULTS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WITHIN OR OUTSIDE SOUTHERN SUDAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window