ROTARY CLUB OF MELTON MOWBRAY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1016947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising for the support of charitable activities and the personal involvement in those activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £21,201
Total expenditure: £11,043

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 February 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KATE THEOBALD Trustee 24 November 2014
None on record
ALISON BLYTHE Trustee 23 May 2013
None on record
DAVID WARD Trustee 23 May 2013
None on record
JAMES EDWARD GREEN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £18.30k £7.76k £10.00k £6.93k £21.20k
Total expenditure £20.25k £4.67k £11.85k £6.64k £11.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 09 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 17 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 29 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 12 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 09 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 Eperson Way
Waltham On The Wolds
MELTON MOWBRAY
Leicestershire
LE14 4DQ
Phone:
07837291916