Accounts and annual returns GREAT OXENDON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1016964
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 May 2021 11 March 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 02 May 2020 28 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 02 May 2019 13 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 02 May 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 02 May 2017 17 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 May 2017 Not Required