Dogfen lywodraethu YOUNG MINDS TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JANUARY 1993 AS AMENDED 14 JULY 2001 AND 31 JULY 2007 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 23 JULY 2008. as amended on 26 Sep 2018 as amended on 07 Nov 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY (THE ¶OBJECTS÷) ARE:- (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BODIES AND AGENCIES, ABOUT THE EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL DISTURBANCES AND MENTAL DISTRESS EXPERIENCED BY CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND FAMILIES, AND ABOUT THE ALLEVIATION AND PREVENTION THEREOF; AND (B) THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND FAMILIES WHO ARE EXPERIENCING OR ARE AFFECTED BY, OR WHO ARE AT RISK OF EXPERIENCING OR BEING AFFECTED BY, EMOTIONAL OR PSYCHOLOGICAL DISTURBANCES OR MENTAL DISTRESS.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.