YOUNG MINDS TRUST

Charity number: 1016968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JENNIFER ANN CLAYTON BSC ECON Trustee 31 January 2018 None on record
Simon Charles Major Trustee 31 January 2018 None on record
Meryl Davies Trustee 24 January 2018 None on record
Julie Dodd Trustee 01 June 2016 None on record
Imogen Arden-Jones Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
Yoojeong Kim Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
Alexander Charles George Calcutt Trustee 05 December 2018 None on record
Robert Leslie William Mack Trustee 10 March 2014 None on record
Caroline Hope Trustee 31 January 2018 None on record