Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF JOHN BALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1017014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 01 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 31 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 31 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 17 January 2020 231 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 17 January 2020 231 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 23 June 2019 388 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 23 June 2019 388 days late Download Open in new window