Financial history REALL LIMITED

Charity number: 1017255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £15.13m £12.20m £3.65m £9.45m £7.84m
Total expenditure £6.02m £11.65m £9.71m £6.92m £9.00m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.06m £1.99m £0 £3.52m £1.31m
Income - Donations and legacies £35.96k £30.80k £14.96k £84.10k £14.40k
Income - Other trading activities £120 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £15.08m £12.10m £3.54m £9.30m £7.82m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.03k £68.54k £90.97k £62.93k £8.64k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £5.50k £1.11k £0 £58.97k £612
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.97m £11.63m £9.70m £6.92m £8.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds £54.24k £16.72k £11.84k £6.47k £8.58k
Expenditure - Governance £28.13k £233 £1.15k £24.78k £463
Expenditure - Grants institution £735.49k £0 £0 £886.39k £5.15m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £33.52k