WARMLEY COMMUNITY CENTRE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education - Learning through play
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 11 February 1993: Standard registration
- 23 August 2021: Funds received from 1172209 WARMLEY PRESCHOOL
- WARMLEY COMMUNITY CENTRE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- WARMLEY COMMUNITY CENTRE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Giulia Foligno | Chair | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kim Cross | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Storr | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Ethridge | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Wakenshaw | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.90k | £75.82k | £71.16k | £107.02k | £99.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.80k | £65.36k | £71.09k | £90.81k | £98.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £102.84k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 16 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2024
(These accounts |
16 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/03/1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03/10/2013
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE PLAYGROUP
Contact information
- Address:
-
WARMLEY COMMUNITY CENTRE
20 DEANERY ROAD
KINGSWOOD
BRISTOL
BS15 9JB
- Phone:
- 07951 309201
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window