Accounts and annual returns PRESIDENTS CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1017310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 23 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 28 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 28 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 30 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 30 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2016 24 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 24 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window