Financial history PRESIDENTS CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1017310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £2.05m £1.53m £1.13m £783 £47
Total expenditure £2.20m £1.31m £660.96k £467.20k £234.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £2.05m £1.53m £1.13m N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £677 £377 £330 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.20m £528.01k £86.47k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £782.08k £574.49k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.20k £4.80k £14.40k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A