Financial history NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL AFTER-CARE IN REGISTERED CARE HOMES

Charity number: 1017330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £960 £2.36k £5.25k £3.84k £1.43k
Total expenditure £958 £2.29k £5.15k £3.62k £1.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A