Trustees THE ELTON JOHN AIDS FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1017336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JAMES FURNISH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kevin Martinez | Trustee | 25 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tani Austin | Trustee | 25 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Cooper | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Lee | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Kane | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ajaz Khowaj Quoram Ahmed | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ilana Kloss | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Blackwell | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Richard Dybul | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.