Financial history CENTRE FOR THE STUDY OF FINANCIAL INNOVATION

Charity number: 1017352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £603.62k £547.74k £541.47k £425.28k £326.30k
Total expenditure £598.26k £580.83k £527.65k £531.97k £362.75k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £6.64k £2.28k
Income - Donations and legacies £288.50k £296.43k £335.41k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £315.06k £249.73k £206.04k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £1.58k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £67 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £18 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £363.90k £375.70k £357.48k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £234.36k £205.13k £170.17k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £9.90k £7.71k £8.15k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A