GREENWICH AND BEXLEY COMMUNITY HOSPICE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF PAIN AND SUFFERING AMONG THE ILL, THE PROVISION, MANAGEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A HOSPICE AND ASSOCIATED COMMUNITY AND OUTREACH SERVICES FOR PEOPLE WITH LIFE LIMITING ILLNESS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND FRIENDS, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE HEALTH OF THOSE AFFECTED BY BEREAVEMENT AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PROFESSIONALS AND THE PUBLIC IN THE RELIEF OF PAIN AND SUFFERING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£12,091,585
Donations and legacies | £3.01m | |
Charitable activities | £6.72m | |
Other trading activities | £2.20m | |
Investments | £20.90k | |
Other | £139.51k |
Total expenditure:
£13,150,107
Raising funds | £705.90k | |
Charitable activities | £10.07m | |
Other | £2.38m |
£76,084 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,000,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £5,718,744 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.08m | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.07m |
People

205 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
330 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 9 |
£80k to £90k | 5 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bexley
- Greenwich
Governance
- 25 February 1993: Standard registration
- GREENWICH AND BEXLEY COTTAGE HOSPICE (Working name)
- GREENWICH AND BEXLEY COTTAGE HOSPICE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Higgins | Chair | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tolu Timeyin | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Green | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Francis Drobniewski MA FRCPath | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Alison Roberts | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Osaji | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Williams | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Manal Sadik | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate Sinead McGranaghan Chow | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Komal Whittaker-Axon | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Middleton | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Estelle Kerridge | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Atterbury Thomas | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Di Marino | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.45m | £9.71m | £10.58m | £12.02m | £12.09m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.45m | £8.98m | £9.73m | £11.02m | £13.15m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £3.78m | N/A | £539.55k | £870.58k | £1.00m | |
|
Income from government grants | £310.00k | £6.33m | £5.19m | £4.97m | £5.72m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.14m | £2.29m | £2.29m | £3.26m | £3.01m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.15m | £1.01m | £2.35m | £0 | £2.20m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.78m | £4.12m | £4.48m | £8.76m | £6.72m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £29.76k | £20.22k | £21.92k | £0 | £20.90k | |
|
Income - Other | £356.65k | £2.27m | £1.43m | £0 | £139.51k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.68m | £682.33k | £969.28k | £1.50m | £791.73k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.98m | £6.53m | £7.26m | £8.45m | £10.07m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £552.50k | £591.10k | £629.42k | £2.57m | £705.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £46.18k | £34.12k | £61.89k | £101.84k | £236.42k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £96.02k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.92m | £1.86m | £1.84m | £0 | £2.38m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.26m | £6.21m | £6.09m | £6.03m | £6.19m | |
|
Long-term investments | £699.85k | £811.34k | £891.57k | £1.02m | £1.09m | |
|
Other assets | £3.90m | £4.81m | £7.53m | £8.16m | £7.18m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £669.43k | £814.13k | £2.58m | £2.32m | £2.55m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/09/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/01/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/06/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/07/2011 as amended on 11 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES, FOR THE RELIEF OF PAIN AND SUFFERING AMONG THE ILL, THE PROVISION, MANAGEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A HOSPICE AND ASSOCIATED COMMUNITY AND OUTREACH SERVICES FOR PEOPLE WITH LIFE LIMITING ILLNESS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND FRIENDS, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE HEALTH OF THOSE AFFECTED BY BEREAVEMENT AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PROFESSIONALS AND THE PUBLIC IN THE RELIEF OF PAIN AND SUFFERING.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS OF GREENWICH AND BEXLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greenwich & Bexley Community Hospic
185 Bostall Hill
LONDON
SE2 0GB
- Phone:
- 02083122244
- Email:
- info@gbch.org.uk
- Website:
-
communityhospice.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window