CREWE MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity Number: 1017441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE CHOIR PROVIDES A FRIENDLY OPPORTUNITY FOR MEN IN SOUTH CHESHIRE TO SING SOME 10 CONCERTS PER YEAR. OFTEN, WE SING FOR CHARITABLE CAUSES. WIVES AND PARTNERS TAKE A FULL PART IN CHOIR EVENTS AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES. WE ARE FORGING NEW CONTRACTS WITH OUR NEW AUTHORITY, CHESHIRE EAST. LINKS WITH TWIN TOWNS IN GERMANY AND POLAND CONTINUE.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £5,165
Total expenditure: £5,465

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 February 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ken Jones Jones Trustee 14 January 2023
None on record
MARSHALL RAYMOND SHAW Trustee 04 February 2019
None on record
Meurig Williams Trustee 26 February 2018
None on record
MARSHALL SHAW Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £6.16k £4.49k £4.50k £6.75k £5.17k
Total expenditure £4.18k £3.76k £2.90k £5.14k £5.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 10 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 26 July 2023 238 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 29 March 2021 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
91 BRADWALL ROAD
SANDBACH
CW11 1GN
Phone:
01270255355
Website:

No information available