Financial history LONDON HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1017579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £398.41k £307.27k £109.80k £109.80k £104.89k
Total expenditure £41.09k £69.05k £111.94k £111.94k £104.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £18.91k
Income from government grants N/A £160.10k N/A £33.64k £61.67k