Trustees LONDON HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1017579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Georgina Ruth Nayler Chair 01 April 2021
THE CHARLES CAUSLEY TRUST
Received: On time
PITZHANGER MANOR & GALLERY TRUST
Received: On time
THE CHARLOTTE BONHAM-CARTER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Charles Howard King Swindall Trustee 17 November 2022
None on record
Peter Jenkins Trustee 28 April 2021
None on record
Li Li Long Trustee 19 March 2020
None on record
Philip David Smith Trustee 19 March 2020
None on record
Alice Clare Louise Yates Trustee 19 March 2020
None on record
Paul Thomas Atkinson Trustee 19 March 2020
None on record
David Frank Gibson RIBA AABC Trustee 25 July 2019
None on record
Sarah Jane Buckingham BA MSc Trustee 25 July 2019
None on record
Rosemary Susan Fraser Trustee 01 December 2016
None on record
ALEC PAUL FORSHAW Trustee 09 December 2014
SPITALFIELDS HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST LIMITED
Received: 41 days late
STEPHEN ANDREW ENTHOVEN ACIS Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL WYNYARD BROOKE BA DipArch Trustee
None on record