Accounts and annual returns THRESHOLD HOUSING LINK

Charity number: 1017599
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 March 2024 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 March 2024 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window