Accounts and annual returns CROMFORD SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1017698

Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 264 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 11 March 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window