Financial history CROMFORD SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1017698
Charity reporting is overdue by 451 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.72k £4.59k £5.85k £3.44k £3.33k
Total expenditure £7.54k £4.24k £6.74k £3.89k £3.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A