Financial history GALLIMORE TRUST

Charity number: 1017708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £1.84k £1.47k £933 £420 £871
Total expenditure £14.38k £54.75k £46.94k £54.13k £25.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A