Financial history EGERTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1017737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £3.65k £2.29k £3.02k £2.18k £923
Total expenditure £3.87k £2.49k £3.87k £2.05k £640
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A