HELP FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Help Fund provides support and financial assistance by way of grant and/or loan to all staff currently employed by Kent County Council when they find themselves in financial difficulties, also retired employees of Kent County Council and former employees of Kent County Council who are unemployed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

20 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Kent
Governance
- 02 March 1993: Standard registration
- 29 April 2015: Funds transferred to 1157386 OLIVE TREE CANCER SUPPORT GROUP
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Ginley | Chair | 17 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Waddup | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Weaver | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Sutton | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria McLauchlan | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Glynn | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Blockley | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Maria Victoria Nicholas | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janice Lee Miller | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Rachel Westlake | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Collin Green | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Katie Pettitt | Trustee | 25 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Harden | Trustee | 02 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Wood | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Berdo | Trustee | 28 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
George Chandler | Trustee | 30 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Lucey-Lamb | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALLISON LOUISE CAMPBELL-SMITH | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
KAREN ELIZABETH STONE | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANE ELIZABETH BLENKINSOP | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.41k | £12.17k | £12.26k | £12.45k | £12.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.91k | £17.00k | £6.48k | £4.08k | £10.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2023 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2023 | 730 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9 FEBRUARY 1993 AS AMENDED ON 7 JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
TO GRANT ASSISTANCE TO CASES OF NEED TO THE DEPENDANTS OF EMPLOYEES OF THE DONOR WHO HAVE DIED WHILST IN THE SERVICE OF THE DONOR AND TO GRANT ASSISTANCE TO THE DEPENDANTS AS AFORESAID IN CASES OF NEED ARISING AS A RESULT OF THE SAID EMPLOYEES BEING ON SICK LEAVE WITHOUT PAY OR PAY AT A REDUCED RATE AND TO GRANT ASSISTANCE TO PREMATURELY RETIRED EMPLOYEES OF THE DONOR IN CASES OF NEED ARISING THROUGH ILL HEALTH OR OTHER CIRCUMSTANCES AND AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES TO GRANT ASSISTANCE TO FORMER EMPLOYEES OF THE DONOR IN CASES OF NEED IN CIRCUMSTANCES NOT COVERED BY THE ABOVE AND TO GRANT ASSISTANCE TO EMPLOYEES OF THE DONOR IN CASES OF NEED IN CIRCUMSTANCES NOT COVERED BY THE ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
KENT COUNTY COUNCIL
SESSIONS HOUSE
COUNTY ROAD
MAIDSTONE
ME14 1XQ
- Phone:
- +3000416733
- Email:
- helpfund@kent.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window