Financial history THE FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF ST JAMES THE GREAT SCHOOL

Charity number: 1017914
Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £45.03k £25.17k £11.35k £1.88k £19.85k
Total expenditure £19.46k £17.94k £24.86k £4.54k £6.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A