CLEARING HOUSE FOR POSTGRADUATE COURSES IN CLINICAL PSYCHOLOGY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to advance the science and profession of Clinical Psychology, in particular by providing a system for processing applications to postgraduate professional training in clinical psychology and by supporting relevant research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People
4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 March 1993: Standard registration
- CLEARING HOUSE FOR P C C P (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr CLAIRE LOMAX | Chair | 11 October 2017 |
|
|||||
MARK BALLHAM | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr GAVIN RICHARDSON | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr TOMAS ISHERWOOD | Trustee | 28 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.91k | £143.55k | £241.80k | £251.71k | £263.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.68k | £135.67k | £136.08k | £156.92k | £194.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 23 April 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 23 April 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 NOV 1992 AS AMENDED ON 05 JUL 1993 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUN 2002 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED ON 11 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SCIENCE AND PROFESSION OF CLINICAL PSYCHOLOGY, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING A SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING APPLICATIONS TO POSTGRADUATE PROFESSIONAL TRAINING IN CLINICAL PSYCHOLOGY AND BY SUPPORTING RELEVANT RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clearing House
Room 10.83a
Worsley Building
Clarendon Way
LEEDS
LS2 9NL
- Phone:
- 01133432737
- Email:
- chpccp@leeds.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window