Accounts and annual returns COLDEN COMMON PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1018451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window