Financial history COLDEN COMMON PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1018451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £112.88k £94.04k £103.18k £97.23k £159.66k
Total expenditure £90.41k £88.89k £103.18k £111.25k £153.19k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £79.02k £63.11k £500 £3.89k £22.49k