COMMUNITY LINKS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1018517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 August 2020 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 August 2020 58 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 October 2019 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 01 October 2019 93 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 11 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time Download