COMMUNITY LINKS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1018517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.61m £5.47m £3.76m £3.40m £2.36m
Total expenditure £5.45m £5.56m £3.21m £3.12m £2.10m
Income from government contracts £1.04m £572.42k £294.91k £487.18k £500.58k
Income from government grants £241.89k £0 N/A £304.73k £193.18k
Income - Donations and legacies £745.47k £1.11m £1.84m £1.15m £708.74k
Income - Other trading activities £814.66k £80.71k £0 £105.27k £110.02k
Income - Charitable activities £3.05m £4.28m £1.84m £2.15m £1.39m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.79k £1.70k £88.03k £317 £293
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £158.95k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.36m £4.47m £2.79m £2.98m £2.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £417.34k £549.14k £420.09k £135.83k £63.55k
Expenditure - Governance £192.88k £203.83k £22.56k £20.88k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £669.07k £548.60k £0 £0 £0