1ST HECKMONDWIKE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1018577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scouting, including camps, trips & outings to local museums etc. & sports events within the group & in the district

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £29,282
Total expenditure: £55,617

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kirklees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 March 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NEIL FOSTER Chair
None on record
Stephen Mark Chapman Trustee 09 May 2023
None on record
Paul Gooch Trustee 25 May 2017
None on record
IAN WOMERSLEY Trustee
None on record
STEVEN HAROLD KING Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.83k £33.45k £27.37k £89.14k £29.28k
Total expenditure £35.42k £11.75k £29.63k £62.84k £55.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k £12.70k £75.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 January 2025 346 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 January 2025 346 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
First Heckmondwike Scouts
Thomas Street
Heckmondwike
West Yorkshire
WF16 0NW
Phone:
07757999728
Website:

No information available