TREMAINS FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1018753
Charity reporting is overdue by 631 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 265 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 265 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 631 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 631 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 June 2017 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required