TREMAINS FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1018753
Charity reporting is overdue by 543 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £7.15k £7.57k £8.20k £6.94k £9.41k
Total expenditure £5.12k £10.39k £17.69k £5.46k £4.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A