Accounts and annual returns STRATFORD PREPARATORY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1018892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required