STEPHEN OLIVER TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 March 1993: Standard registration
- 21 November 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 21 November 2007: Funds transferred to 1031783 COUNTESS OF MUNSTER MUSICAL TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £615 | |
|
Total expenditure | £356 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 MARCH 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE CREATION PROMOTION AND PERFORMANCE OF CONTEMPORARY OPERA AND CHAMBER WORKS FOR THE STAGE AND RELATED CHARITABLE ARTISTIC ACTIVITIES AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY PARTICULARLY BY SUPPORTING AND MAKING PROVISION FOR PERSONS IN NEED CONNECTED OR FORMALLY CONNECTED WITH THE PRACTICE OF CONTEMPORARY OPERA OR SEEKING TRAINING OR EDUCATION RELATED THERETO AND FOR ANY OTHER RELEVANT CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window