Financial history CHRISTIAN SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1019015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £8.69k £10.49k £9.07k £6.29k £4.76k
Total expenditure £12.48k £8.22k £7.98k £5.82k £4.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A