Financial history BRITISH FRIENDS OF HOREB SCHOOLS

Charity number: 1019145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £22.25k £28.00k £11.90k £0 £0
Total expenditure £22.15k £8.50k £31.80k £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A