THE FRIENDS OF MERSEA SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various family and community events are held throughout the year to raise funds which are donated to Mersea Island School to purchase equipment and fund educational activities to benefit the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 29 March 1993: Standard registration
- MSA (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Alan Joslin | Chair | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Child | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Kirkman | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sadie Roffe | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Rees | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.71k | £11.51k | £7.70k | £18.42k | £7.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.41k | £12.98k | £6.32k | £6.91k | £5.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 September 2024 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 August 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED IN 1979 AND AMENDED ON 1/10/1991 AND 17/10/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
PUPILS AT WEST MERSEA SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Seaview Avenue
West Mersea
COLCHESTER
CO5 8HE
- Phone:
- 01206382736
- Email:
- office@merseaschool.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window