CASTLE COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1019330
Charity reporting is overdue by 309 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £7.07k £9.37k £5.00k £7.89k £0
Total expenditure £6.19k £9.09k £6.60k £4.49k £747
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A