RED HOT AIDS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 30 March 1993: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- RED HOT UK (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 DECEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT THE PREVENTION OF AIDS HIV AND APPARENTLY RELATED DISEASES AND THE EFFECTS OF SUCH DISEASES AND CONDITIONS IN PARTICULAR AMONG PEOPLE WHO SUFFER FROM OR WHO ARE AT RISK OF BEING AFFECTED BY SUCH DISEASES AND CONDITIONS AND THOSE WHO WORK WITH OR OTHERWISE CARE FOR THEM B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG PEOPLE WHO SUFFER FROM SUCH DISEASES AND CONDITIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window