Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF WENDENS AMBO CHURCH

Charity number: 1019341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required