Accounts and annual returns WEST COKER CHURCH HALL

Charity number: 1019504
Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 206 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 206 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required