TILLINGBOURNE COUNTY JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity exists to offer support to and raise funds for Tillingbourne Junior School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 07 April 1993: Standard registration
- TILLINGBOURNE SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- TILLINGBOURNE COUNTY MIDDLE SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Dawn Staniforth | Chair | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.19k | £6.91k | £9.87k | £13.04k | £11.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.28k | £2.90k | £3.70k | £24.38k | £14.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 14/11/1974 AND AMENDED ON 01/10/1992 AND 14 SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TILLINGBOURNE SCHOOL
NEW ROAD
CHILWORTH
GUILDFORD
SURREY
GU4 8NB
- Phone:
- 01483504384
- Email:
- pta.tillingbourne@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window