Financial history 19TH PRESTWICH (ST ANDREWS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1019768
Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £8.61k £3.86k £6.28k £18.55k £5.17k
Total expenditure £10.23k £3.40k £6.75k £4.62k £5.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A