PURINE METABOLIC PATIENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1019792
Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 187 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 187 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 552 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 552 days
Annual return 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 918 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 918 days
Annual return 31 July 2017 19 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 22 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required