PURINE METABOLIC PATIENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1019792
Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017
Total gross income £17.62k £5.99k £10.42k £12.01k £2.53k
Total expenditure £25.35k £109.69k £123.04k £83.96k £99.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A